TX HR1315 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the launch of the 2017 ChildSafe Cardboard Kids campaign in Del Rio.
Title
Commemorating the launch of the 2017 ChildSafe Cardboard Kids campaign in Del Rio.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-04-05 | House | Filed |