TX HR1296 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Ennis High School assistant football coach Paul Willingham on receiving a 2021 High School Broyles Award.
Title
Congratulating Ennis High School assistant football coach Paul Willingham on receiving a 2021 High School Broyles Award.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Ellzey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-26 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-18 | House | Filed |