TX HR1293 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring former teacher and principal Ed Swenson of Milano on his 90th birthday.
Title
Honoring former teacher and principal Ed Swenson of Milano on his 90th birthday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-04-17 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-04-02 | House | Filed |