TX HR1293 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Caitlin Magill, captain of the Marquettes drill team of Marcus High School in Flower Mound, for her showing at the Crowd Pleasers Fossil Ridge dance team competition.
Title
Honoring Caitlin Magill, captain of the Marquettes drill team of Marcus High School in Flower Mound, for her showing at the Crowd Pleasers Fossil Ridge dance team competition.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-04-23 | Adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |