TX HR1292 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Natalie and Dorian Lamb on the adoption of their five children, Dre, Nev, Sadie, Daisy, and Jackson.
Title
Congratulating Natalie and Dorian Lamb on the adoption of their five children, Dre, Nev, Sadie, Daisy, and Jackson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-26 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-19 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LAMB, DAISY
LAMB, DRE
LAMB, JACKSON
LAMB, NATALIE & DORIAN
LAMB, NEV
LAMB, SADIE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
LAMB, DRE
LAMB, JACKSON
LAMB, NATALIE & DORIAN
LAMB, NEV
LAMB, SADIE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary