TX HR1270 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the rededication of Daniels Cross Evans Elks Lodge No. 1578 in Dallas.
Title
Commemorating the rededication of Daniels Cross Evans Elks Lodge No. 1578 in Dallas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-06 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Filed |