TX HR1265 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Ray Raymond for his many years of service on the Trinity Valley Community College Board of Trustees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Ray Raymond for his many years of service on the Trinity Valley Community College Board of Trustees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-08HouseReported enrolled
2023-05-06HouseAdopted
2023-05-06HouseLaid before the House
2023-05-06HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2023-05-03HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2023-04-26HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2023-04-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback