TX HR1250 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing Emma Cullins Holland of Heath on being the first person to lose a tooth on the floor of the Texas House of Representatives during a legislative session.
Title
Recognizing Emma Cullins Holland of Heath on being the first person to lose a tooth on the floor of the Texas House of Representatives during a legislative session.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] |
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Filed |