TX HR1246 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Jeriah Yu of the Liberal Arts and Science Academy in Austin on finishing in the top 100 contestants in the 2021 CyberStart America National Cyber Scholarship Competition.
Title
Congratulating Jeriah Yu of the Liberal Arts and Science Academy in Austin on finishing in the top 100 contestants in the 2021 CyberStart America National Cyber Scholarship Competition.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-16 | House | Filed |