TX HR1230 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Mary Nelle Cummins as the founder of the Community Health Clinic of Collin County.
Title
Honoring Mary Nelle Cummins as the founder of the Community Health Clinic of Collin County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-06 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Filed |