TX HR1229 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Joy and Greg Booth on the fifth anniversary of E. J. Wills Gastropub in McKinney.
Title
Congratulating Joy and Greg Booth on the fifth anniversary of E. J. Wills Gastropub in McKinney.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-06 | House | Adopted |
2023-05-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Filed |