TX HR1204 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Raudel Garza on being named executive director of the Edinburg Economic Development Corporation.
Title
Congratulating Raudel Garza on being named executive director of the Edinburg Economic Development Corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-28 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-28 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-21 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Filed |