TX HR1204 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Brenham High School Marine Corps Junior ROTC team on winning the overall title at the 2021 national championship.
Title
Congratulating the Brenham High School Marine Corps Junior ROTC team on winning the overall title at the 2021 national championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Leman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-14 | House | Filed |