TX HR1198 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating James and Leeshan Chuang Birney for their business success and commending them for their community service efforts in the Houston area.
Title
Congratulating James and Leeshan Chuang Birney for their business success and commending them for their community service efforts in the Houston area.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-13 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-13 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed |