TX HR1170 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 30, 2017, as Balch Springs Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 30, 2017, as Balch Springs Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-30 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BALCH SPRINGS DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates