TX HR1166 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Judy Moore on being named Teacher Advocate of the Year by the Texas Public Charter Schools Association.
Title
Congratulating Judy Moore on being named Teacher Advocate of the Year by the Texas Public Charter Schools Association.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-23 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-13 | House | Filed |