TX HR1160 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to unite in bipartisan support for the ratification of the United States-Mexico-Canada Agreement.
Title
Urging Congress to unite in bipartisan support for the ratification of the United States-Mexico-Canada Agreement.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Tom Craddick [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-10 - House - Adopted RV#1340 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-10 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-10 | House | Record vote RV#1340 |
2019-05-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-10 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-04-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
UNITED STATES-MEXICO-CANADA AGREEMENT
UNITED STATES-MEXICO-CANADA AGREEMENT--USMCA
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
UNITED STATES-MEXICO-CANADA AGREEMENT
UNITED STATES-MEXICO-CANADA AGREEMENT--USMCA