TX HR116 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulating the Cane Island Alers of Katy on winning the Gambrinus Club Award from the American Homebrewers Association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Congratulating the Cane Island Alers of Katy on winning the Gambrinus Club Award from the American Homebrewers Association.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-16HouseReported enrolled
2017-08-15HouseAdopted
2017-08-15HouseRules suspended
2017-08-15HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2017-08-14HouseConsidered in Rules and Resolutions
2017-07-27HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2017-07-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback