TX HR116 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commemorating the centennial of The University of Texas at Austin Department of Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating the centennial of The University of Texas at Austin Department of Government.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-24 Reported enrolled
2011-02-23 Adopted
2011-02-23 Rules suspended
2011-02-24 Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2011-02-22 Considered in Rules and Resolutions
2011-02-16 Referred to Rules & Resolutions
2011-01-12 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback