TX HR116 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-16 - Reported enrolled

Summary

In memory of Harold Spencer Stone of Katy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In memory of Harold Spencer Stone of Katy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-16 Reported enrolled
2009-02-26 Adopted
2009-02-26 Laid before the House
2009-02-26 Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2009-02-24 Considered in Rules and Resolutions
2009-02-18 Referred to Rules & Resolutions
2009-01-14 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback