TX HR1131 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Kassidy McCullough of St. Mary's Catholic School in Longview for winning the bronze medal in the 1A women's shot put at the 2021 TAPPS Track and Field State Championships.
Title
Congratulating Kassidy McCullough of St. Mary's Catholic School in Longview for winning the bronze medal in the 1A women's shot put at the 2021 TAPPS Track and Field State Championships.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Dean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed |