TX HR1116 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Patricia A. Davis on her retirement from the Dallas College Cedar Valley Campus.
Title
Congratulating Patricia A. Davis on her retirement from the Dallas College Cedar Valley Campus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed |