TX HR1082 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Dr. Yuba Raj Khatiwada, Nepal's ambassador to the United States, on the occasion of his visit to Irving.
Title
Honoring Dr. Yuba Raj Khatiwada, Nepal's ambassador to the United States, on the occasion of his visit to Irving.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Meza [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-10 | House | Filed |