TX HR1070 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Dr. Ruth Simmons, president of Prairie View A&M University, on her selection as principal speaker for the 2021 Harvard University commencement celebration.
Title
Congratulating Dr. Ruth Simmons, president of Prairie View A&M University, on her selection as principal speaker for the 2021 Harvard University commencement celebration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Filed |