TX HR1064 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the memory of Linda Anne Hoffman of Plano on the occasion of the Carrollton Women's Club Spring Luncheon.
Title
Honoring the memory of Linda Anne Hoffman of Plano on the occasion of the Carrollton Women's Club Spring Luncheon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-20 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-20 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-11 | House | Filed |