TX HR105 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Fresenius Kidney Care for its service to patients with kidney disease across the state of Texas.
Title
Honoring Fresenius Kidney Care for its service to patients with kidney disease across the state of Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - Adopted RV#45 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-08 | House | Record vote RV#45 |
2023-03-08 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-08 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-06 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed |