TX HR1027 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Annie Zhu on graduating as valedictorian of the Class of 2021 at Bellaire High School.
Title
Congratulating Annie Zhu on graduating as valedictorian of the Class of 2021 at Bellaire High School.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-14 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Filed |