TX HR1025 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to recognize the importance of trade between Texas and Mexico.
Title
Urging Congress to recognize the importance of trade between Texas and Mexico.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Adopted as amended RV#729 (Y: 130 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Adopted as amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Amended |
2017-05-04 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS & COMMERCE
MEXICO
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
MEXICO
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress