TX HR10 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Honoring Robert Griffin III for winning the 2011 Heisman Trophy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring Robert Griffin III for winning the 2011 Heisman Trophy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-14HouseReported enrolled
2013-03-12HouseAdopted
2013-03-12HouseRules suspended
2013-02-04HouseReferred to Rules & Resolutions
2013-01-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback