TX HJR83 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a local option exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the appraised value of the residence homesteads of certain peace officers.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a local option exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the appraised value of the residence homesteads of certain peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1601 (Enabled by) 2021-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
PEACE OFFICERS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
PEACE OFFICERS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions