TX HJR83 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the state or a municipality or county to donate certain property to the United States to promote border crossing security or international bridge trade corridors, to issue public securities to finance the acquisition or construction of that property, and to use public money to make certain payments related to public-private partnerships.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the state or a municipality or county to donate certain property to the United States to promote border crossing security or international bridge trade corridors, to issue public securities to finance the acquisition or construction of that property, and to use public money to make certain payments related to public-private partnerships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJR66 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
Subjects
BORDER
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Financial
Financial--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Financial
Financial--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments