TX HJR82 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of and use of money in the generate recurring oil wealth for Texas (GROW Texas) fund and allocating certain general revenues to that fund, the economic stabilization fund, and the state highway fund.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of and use of money in the generate recurring oil wealth for Texas (GROW Texas) fund and allocating certain general revenues to that fund, the economic stabilization fund, and the state highway fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Craddick [R] | Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R] | Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] |
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] |
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] | Rep. Tracy King [D] | Rep. Ben Leman [R] |
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Adopted RV#943 (Y: 121 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#943 |
2019-05-02 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-24 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2154 (Enabled by) 2019-05-10 - Point of order sustained Article III, Section 30, and Article III, Section 35
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Oil & Gas
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources
Oil & Gas
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Energy Resources