TX HJR78 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Applying to the Congress of the United States to call a convention under Article V of the United States Constitution for the limited purpose of proposing an amendment to the constitution to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government.
Title
Applying to the Congress of the United States to call a convention under Article V of the United States Constitution for the limited purpose of proposing an amendment to the constitution to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Workman [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Rep. John Wray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2015-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BALANCED BUDGET
Congress
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions--United States Constitution
Congress
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions--United States Constitution