TX HJR72 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit this state or a political subdivision of this state from prohibiting or limiting religious services of religious organizations.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to prohibit this state or a political subdivision of this state from prohibiting or limiting religious services of religious organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2021-05-11 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SJR 27 |
2021-05-10 | House | Postponed 5/11/21 10:00 AM |
2021-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJR27 (Same As) 2021-05-19 - Filed with the Secretary of State
HB3596 (Enabled by) 2021-03-22 - Referred to State Affairs
HB3596 (Enabled by) 2021-03-22 - Referred to State Affairs