TX HJR56 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to limit the total amount of ad valorem taxes that a school district may impose on the residence homestead of an individual and the surviving spouse of the individual if the individual qualifies the property as the individual's residence homestead for 15 consecutive tax years and the school taxes on the property increase by at least 120 percent during that period.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to limit the total amount of ad valorem taxes that a school district may impose on the residence homestead of an individual and the surviving spouse of the individual if the individual qualifies the property as the individual's residence homestead for 15 consecutive tax years and the school taxes on the property increase by at least 120 percent during that period.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1102 (Enabled by) 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
SJR33 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Property Tax
SJR33 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Property Tax
Subjects
Education
Education--School Districts
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Education--School Districts
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--School District
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR56 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00056I.htm |