TX HJR52 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation a portion of the assessed value of certain real property used to provide housing to certain individuals with disabilities.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to exempt from ad valorem taxation a portion of the assessed value of certain real property used to provide housing to certain individuals with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - Adopted RV#1031 (Y: 108 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-08 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB850 (Enabled by) 2017-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions