TX HJR48 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment limiting the permissible uses of the state highway fund, including further limiting the use of additional tax and fee revenue attributable to changes to certain state taxes and fees, to increase revenue for nontolled public highway purposes.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment limiting the permissible uses of the state highway fund, including further limiting the use of additional tax and fee revenue attributable to changes to certain state taxes and fees, to increase revenue for nontolled public highway purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-18 | House | Correction in referral |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB399 (Enabled by) 2015-03-18 - Referred to Transportation
HB401 (Enabled by) 2015-02-18 - Referred to Transportation
HB401 (Enabled by) 2015-02-18 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
Highways
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HJR48 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HJ00048I.htm |