TX HJR39 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the denial of bail to certain persons charged with a violent or sexual offense after having been previously convicted of a violent or sexual offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the denial of bail to certain persons charged with a violent or sexual offense after having been previously convicted of a violent or sexual offense.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-06HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2013-02-06HouseRead first time
2012-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback