TX HJR38 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 92-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the imposition of an individual income tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the imposition of an individual income tax.

Sponsors

Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]
Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]
Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]
Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]
Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Sam Harless [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]
Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Lyle Larson [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]
Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]
Rep. Carl Sherman [D]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]
Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]
Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]
Rep. John Zerwas [R]Sen. Pat Fallon [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]
Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]Sen. Peter Flores [R]
Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Robert Nichols [R]Sen. Angela Paxton [R]
Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]Sen. Kel Seliger [R]Sen. Larry Taylor [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Adopted RV#1243 (Y: 100 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Filed with the Secretary of State
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed
2019-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-05-20SenateLaid out as postponed business
2019-05-20SenatePostponed 5/20/19 1:30 PM
2019-05-20SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 West
2019-05-20SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-20SenateRecord vote
2019-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-15SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-13SenateReferred to Finance
2019-05-13SenateRead first time
2019-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09HouseRecord vote RV#1243
2019-05-09HouseAdopted
2019-05-09HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Gutierrez
2019-05-09HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-09HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Gutierrez
2019-05-09HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
2019-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-12HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-02-12HouseRead first time
2018-12-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SJR23 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR38
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00038I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00038E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00038S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00038F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR38&RcdVtNo=1243&Ch=H&Dt=05/09/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F1.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F1.PDF#page=164
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-20-F1.PDF#page=167

Bill Comments

feedback