TX HJR31 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-8)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-09 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment to restrict the power of the legislature to mandate unfunded costs and requirements on a municipality, county, or school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment to restrict the power of the legislature to mandate unfunded costs and requirements on a municipality, county, or school district.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-09HouseCorrected committee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-09HouseCorrected comm. report distributed
2017-08-09HouseCorrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
2017-08-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-08-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-07-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-07-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-07-24HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-07-24HouseRead first time
2017-07-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback