TX HJR30 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-08 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the residence homesteads of certain disabled first responders and their surviving spouses.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the residence homesteads of certain disabled first responders and their surviving spouses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-07 - House - Adopted as amended RV#73 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-08-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-08-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-08-07 | House | Record vote |
2017-08-07 | House | Adopted as amended |
2017-08-07 | House | Amended |
2017-08-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-08-07 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2017-08-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-07-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-07-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-07-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-07-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-07-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-07-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-07-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-07-21 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-07-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-07-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB179 (Enabled by) 2017-08-09 - Received from the House
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions