TX HJR29 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a member of the armed services of the United States who is killed or fatally injured in the line of duty.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a member of the armed services of the United States who is killed or fatally injured in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB475 (Enabled by) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Ways & Means
SJR35 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Filed with the Secretary of State
SJR35 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Subjects
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HJR29 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HJ00029I.htm |