TX HJR29 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment prescribing the purposes for which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees, certain motor vehicle-related taxes, and certain revenues received from the federal government may be used.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment prescribing the purposes for which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees, certain motor vehicle-related taxes, and certain revenues received from the federal government may be used.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pickett [D] | Rep. Linda Koop [R] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-18 | House | Correction in referral |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Highways
Law Enforcement
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Law Enforcement
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General