TX HJR24 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-28 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-28 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of part of the market value of the residence homestead of a partially disabled veteran or the surviving spouse of a partially disabled veteran if the residence homestead was donated to the disabled veteran by a charitable organization.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of part of the market value of the residence homestead of a partially disabled veteran or the surviving spouse of a partially disabled veteran if the residence homestead was donated to the disabled veteran by a charitable organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - HJR 24Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Motion withdrawn |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Motion to suspend regular order of business |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-07 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-07 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2013-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB97 (Enabled by) 2013-05-27 - See remarks for effective date
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions