TX HJR154 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of the centennial parks conservation fund to be administered by the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of the centennial parks conservation fund to be administered by the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJR74 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Filed with the Secretary of State
SJR74 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Filed with the Secretary of State
HB3801 (Enabled by) 2023-04-20 - Left pending in committee
SJR74 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Filed with the Secretary of State
HB3801 (Enabled by) 2023-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control