TX HJR133 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to foster economic development and job growth and to provide tax relief and funding for education and public safety by creating the Texas Gaming Commission, authorizing and regulating casino gaming at a limited number of destination resorts and facilities licensed by the commission, authorizing sports wagering, requiring occupational licenses to conduct casino gaming, and requiring the imposition of a tax.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to foster economic development and job growth and to provide tax relief and funding for education and public safety by creating the Texas Gaming Commission, authorizing and regulating casino gaming at a limited number of destination resorts and facilities licensed by the commission, authorizing sports wagering, requiring occupational licenses to conduct casino gaming, and requiring the imposition of a tax.
Sponsors
Rep. John Kuempel [R] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJR49 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Co-author authorized
HB4237 (Enabled by) 2021-03-29 - Referred to State Affairs
HB4237 (Enabled by) 2021-03-29 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
GAMBLING
GAMING COMMISSION, TEXAS
Legislature
NATIVE AMERICANS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PARI-MUTUEL WAGERING
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Tourism
GAMBLING
GAMING COMMISSION, TEXAS
Legislature
NATIVE AMERICANS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PARI-MUTUEL WAGERING
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Tourism