TX HJR117 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a statewide referendum allowing voters to indicate a preference for exempting this state from daylight saving time or observing daylight saving time year-round.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing a statewide referendum allowing voters to indicate a preference for exempting this state from daylight saving time or observing daylight saving time year-round.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyle Larson [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] |
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Adopted RV#551 (Y: 133 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-23 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#551 |
2019-04-23 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB3784 (Enabled by) 2019-04-26 - Received from the House
Subjects
Daylight Saving Time
Elections
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Elections
Elections--Initiative, Referendum & Recall
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments