TX HJR111 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing legislative action at any time during a regular session of the legislature on a bill that extends the existence of an agency, commission, or advisory committee following legislative review.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing legislative action at any time during a regular session of the legislature on a bill that extends the existence of an agency, commission, or advisory committee following legislative review.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback