TX HJR107 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to increase the mandatory age of retirement for state justices and judges.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to increase the mandatory age of retirement for state justices and judges.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Adopted RV#566 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Adopted RV#566 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#566 |
2023-04-26 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJR40 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Jurisprudence
SJR40 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Jurisprudence
SJR40 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Judges
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Judicial
Courts--Judges
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Judicial