TX HCR90 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to allow health savings accounts to be used for direct primary care.
Title
Urging Congress to allow health savings accounts to be used for direct primary care.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R] | Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HCR90 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HC00090I.htm |